House | 04/22/2019 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/19. | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Reported favorably (7-0). | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/1/2019. | ||
House | 02/26/2019 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 02/26/2019 | Prefiled. |