House | 05/20/2019 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 29, nays 64. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19. | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Reported with amendments (7-0). | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Reported with amendments (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Prefiled. |