House
|
06/13/2019
|
Effective date: 07/01/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 285.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
By a vote of 96 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 26 yeas and 4 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Notice removed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Reported favorably (7-2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|