House
|
06/11/2019
|
Effective date: 08/01/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 314.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2019
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|