Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Reported favorably (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|