House
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 25, nays 56. Failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Reported with amendments (19-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Reported with amendments (10-2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Discharged from the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2019
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/1/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|