House | 05/06/2019 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 35, nays 60. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19. | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/19. | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Reported favorably (14-2). | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Prefiled. |