House | 05/20/2019 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 35, nays 56. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19. | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Reported with amendments (10-0). | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Prefiled. |