House | 05/01/2019 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/19. | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/19. | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Reported with amendments (17-0). | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Prefiled. |