House
|
06/20/2019
|
Effective date: 08/01/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 385.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2019
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 23 yeas and 13 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Colomb, and Appel.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
House conferees appointed: Abramson, Berthelot, and Jimmy Harris.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Reported favorably (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|