House
|
06/11/2019
|
Effective date: 07/01/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 331.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2019
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 81, nays 10. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 5 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Called from the Table.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
By a vote of 26 yeas and 3 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title. By a vote of 23 yeas and 12 nays, the bill failed to receive the required two-thirds vote. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
By a vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 32 yeas and 5 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title. By a vote of 22 yeas and 15 nays, the bill failed to receive the required two-thirds vote.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 8. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Reported with amendments (18-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|