House
|
07/30/2019
|
Effective date: 06/22/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 436.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 7, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Reported with amendments (11-4).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|