Senate | 04/24/2019 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/22/2019 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/19. | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Reported with amendments (5-2). | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/8/2019. | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Prefiled. |