House
|
06/07/2019
|
Effective date: 08/01/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 171.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 10 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 9. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Reported with amendments (13-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|