House
|
06/11/2019
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 247.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 26. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 22. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|