House
|
06/22/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 437.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2019
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Walsworth, Morrish, and White.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
House conferees appointed: Emerson, Nancy Landry, and Thomas.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Reported with amendments (10-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|