House | 05/20/2019 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Reported without action, (12-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Reported without action, (11-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Prefiled. |