House | 05/16/2019 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 39, nays 56. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19. | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Reported with amendments (10-0). | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Prefiled. |