House
|
06/13/2019
|
Effective date: 07/01/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 286.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Reported with amendments (17-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|