House
|
05/30/2019
|
Withdrawn from the files of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 23. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Reported favorably (14-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|