Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Reported with amendments (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|