House
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 46. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 27. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Reported with amendments (12-9).
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|