Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|