Senate
|
06/02/2019
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2019
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|