Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Reported with amendments (18-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2019
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|