Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 73, nays 21. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Cortez, and Martiny.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
House conferees appointed: Talbot, Abramson, and Stefanski.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 85, nays 0. The Senate amendments, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were rejected. Conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th legislative day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
By a vote of 88 yeas, 1 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title. By a vote of 21 yeas and 16 nays, the bill failed to receive the required two-thirds vote.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 16. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|