LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2019 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB604
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB604
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB604
Action History
House
05/08/2019
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
House
05/02/2019
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/19.
House
04/30/2019
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
04/29/2019
Reported with amendments (14-0).
House
04/22/2019
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
House
04/17/2019
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.