House | 04/30/2019 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 47, nays 50. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/19. | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Reported with amendments (11-0). | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019. | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Prefiled. |