Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 28. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Notice removed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 57, nays 40. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Reported with amendments (7-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Reported with amendments (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2019
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|