Senate | 05/07/2019 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19. | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019. | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Prefiled. |