Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Reported favorably (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2019
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|