House
|
06/20/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 418.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Claitor, Boudreaux, and Carter.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
House conferees appointed: Billiot, Mack, and Marino.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Reported with amendments (13-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2019
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|