House | 06/07/2019 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/04/2019 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2019 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 06/02/2019 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 06/02/2019 | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. | ||
House | 06/02/2019 | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/31/2019 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |