Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 57, nays 36. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Notice removed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 52, nays 45. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Reported favorably (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|