House
|
05/21/2019
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Discharged from the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|