House | 05/02/2019 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |