Senate | 05/27/2019 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 83, nays 12. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19. | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | Reported with amendments (6-3). | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |