House | 05/21/2019 | Withdrawn from the files of the House. | ||
House | 05/21/2019 | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19. | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Reported favorably (9-0). | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |