House | 05/21/2019 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/13/2019 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2019 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |