House | 06/04/2019 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 05/31/2019 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19. | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/19. | ||
House | 05/21/2019 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Reported favorably (13-0). | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Rules suspended. |