House | 05/31/2019 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/29/2019 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19. | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Reported favorably (12-0). | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |