House | 06/05/2019 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/04/2019 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/19. | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/29/2019 | Reported favorably (8-0). | ||
House | 05/21/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |