LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2019 Regular Session
House
Bills
HSR2
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HSR2
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2019 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HSR2
Action History
House
05/20/2019
Approved on 5/20/2019.
House
05/16/2019
Study request list distributed to members on 5/16/2019.
House
05/13/2019
Received on 5/13/2019.