Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Effective date 6/19/2019.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 400.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice the House discharged the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Discharged from Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice the Senate discharged the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Conference Committee members discharged.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
House conferees appointed: Marcelle, Hoffmann, and Jackson.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Mills, Peterson, and Barrow.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Reported favorably (20-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Reported with amendments (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|