House
|
05/23/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|