Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Effective date 6/11/2019.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 274.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|