House | 05/22/2019 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2019 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |