Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
House conferees appointed: Gregory Miller, Lance Harris, and Jay Morris.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Peterson, Hewitt, and Peacock.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|