Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 262.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Amendments withdrawn.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported with amendments (8-3). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|