Senate | 05/07/2019 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2019 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2019 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |